Federal signal board of directors
WebFeb 18, 2024 · OAK BROOK, Ill., Feb. 18, 2024 /PRNewswire/ -- The Board of Directors of Federal Signal Corporation (NYSE: FSS) declared a quarterly cash dividend of nine cents ($0.09) per share on its common ... WebFeb 19, 2024 · Feb 19, 2024, 15:05 ET. OAK BROOK, Ill., Feb. 19, 2024 /PRNewswire/ -- The Board of Directors of Federal Signal Corporation (NYSE: FSS ), a leader in environmental and safety solutions, today ...
Federal signal board of directors
Did you know?
WebAs a member of Board of Directors at FEDERAL SIGNAL CORP , Brenda L. Reichelderfer made $222,000 in total compensation. Of this total $112,000 was received as fees earned or paid in cash, $0 was received as non-stock incentive plan compensation, $0 was received as change in pension value and nonqualified deferred compensation … WebJul 25, 2024 · OAK BROOK, Ill., July 25, 2024 /PRNewswire/ --The Board of Directors of Federal Signal Corporation (NYSE: FSS) declared a quarterly cash dividend of nine cents ($0.09) per share on its common stock.
WebApr 29, 2014 · OAK BROOK, Ill., April 29, 2014 /PRNewswire/ -- Federal Signal Corporation (NYSE: FSS), a leader in environmental and safety solutions, announced today that its Board of Directors has named Jennifer L. Sherman as its Chief Operating Officer, effective immediately. This is a new role at the global industrial manufacturing company … WebThe Federal Reserve Bank of Atlanta was established under the Federal Reserve Act in 1914 and is subject to the general oversight and supervision of the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, in Washington, D.C. Duties and responsibilities of head office and branch directors are outlined in the Federal Reserve Act, Board of Governors' …
WebBoard of Directors. ... Chief Accounting Officer Lauren B. Elting is Vice President, Corporate Controller and Chief Accounting Officer of Federal Signal. She was appointed to this position on April 26, 2024. Ms. Elting previously served as Senior Director of Accounting. Prior to joining the Company in January 2024, Ms. Elting worked at Ernst ... WebWhen longtime Chairman and CEO Joseph Ross retired, the Board of Directors took the opportunity to strengthen our corporate governance by separating the Chairman and CEO functions. We are honored to take on the leadership roles under this new structure. I have been an active member of Federal Signal’s Board of Directors since 1999.
WebLauren B. Elting is Vice President, Corporate Controller and Chief Accounting Officer of Federal Signal. She was appointed to this position on April 26, 2024. Ms. Elting …
WebFeb 19, 2024 · Oak Brook, Illinois, February 19, 2024 – The Board of Directors of Federal Signal Corporation (NYSE: FSS), a leader in environmental and safety solutions, today … movidcare texas numberWebMartin has been a member of our Board since March 2008. Prior to becoming our President and CEO, Mr. Martin served as an independent business consultant to manufacturing companies. Mr. Martin served as a director of Essendant Inc. (formerly NASDAQ: ESND), a leading supplier of workplace essentials, from July 2016 to January 2024. heather babcock cpaWebShashank Patel Director: Federal Signal Corp. Dennis J. Martin Chairman: Federal Signal Corp. William Forrester Owens Independent Director: Ocean Biomedical, Inc., Federal … heather bachelorWebOAK BROOK, Illinois, October 26, 2024 — The Board of Directors of Federal Signal Corporation (NYSE: FSS), a leader in environmental and safety solutions, today … heather bacheloretteWebApr 8, 2009 · STAMFORD, Conn.--(BUSINESS WIRE)--Warren B. Kanders, who together with Steven R. Gerbsman and Nicholas Sokolow (together the “Kanders Group”) is … movidy alternativasWebFederal Signal' Executive Officers and mambers of the Board - CSIMarket. Company Name, Ticker, Industry, else.. STOCKS. HOME; ... Federal Signal Corporation's Officers & Directors; Economic Indicators; Federal Signal Corporation's News; movida norte shoppingWebChairman of the Board Former President and CEO Federal Signal Corporation Elected 2008. Jennifer L. Sherman. President and CEO Federal Signal Corporation Elected 2016. Brenda L. Reichelderfer. Lead Independent Director Former SVP and Director TriVista Business Group Elected 2006. Eugene J. Lowe, III. President and CEO SPX … movida toothbrush